Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968255

EP0968255 - PIGMENT FLAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
64271 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
64271 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / POETSCH, Eike
Am Buchwald 4
D-64367 Mühltal 4 / DE
02 / PFAFF, Gerhard
Trautenauer Strasse 41
D-64839 Münster / DE
03 / KUNTZ, Matthias
Im Berggarten 16
D-64342 Seeheim / DE
04 / DEROW, Stephan
Stefan George Weg 11
D-64285 Darmstadt / DE
05 / COATES, David
87 Sopwith Crescent, Merley Wimborne
Doreset BH21 1SW / GB
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98913715.313.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01453
Priority number, dateEP1997010485421.03.1997         Original published format: EP 97104854
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842799
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968255
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968255
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/00, C09K19/38, C09B67/00, C09D5/36
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:PIGMENTFLOCKEN[2000/01]
English:PIGMENT FLAKES[2000/01]
French:PIGMENT EN FLOCONS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
29.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.05.2003
IT28.05.2003
ES08.09.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]FR28.05.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/03]ES08.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[YP]WO9730136  (MERCK PATENT) [YP] 1,5-8,11,12,14 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 36 * * page 19, line 24 - page 20, line 24; claims 1-13 *;
 [YP]WO9800475  (MERCK PATENT) [YP] 1,4,6-8,12 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 26 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 7 * * page 9, line 28 - line 34 * * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 35; claims 1-6,11 *;
 [YP]GB2311289  (MERCK PATENT) [YP] 1,5,6,11,12,14 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 35 * * page 6, line 14 - line 19 * * page 15, line 9 - page 16, line 31; claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]WO9617901  (MERCK PATENT) [Y] 1,4,6,11,12,14 * page 1, line 22 - page 4, line 35 * * page 14, line 5 - line 15 *;
 [YD]EP0171045  (BASF) [YD] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 3 * * page 8, line 23 - line 35 *;
 [YD]EP0260687  (BASF) [YD] 1,2,6 * page 2, line 1 - line 50 *;
 [YD]EP0090282  (BASF) [YD] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 25 *