Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970390

EP0970390 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE VERTICAL DISTANCE BETWEEN AN OBJECT AND A DEVICE WITH A VARIABLE POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / FLEISCHHAUER, Norbert
Stettiner Strasse 7
D-65760 Eschborn / DE
02 / HASSLER, Gregor
Neue Strasse 8
D-65520 Bad Camberg / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Klein, Thomas
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2009/29]
Former [2000/02]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Mannesmann VDO AG Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date98913725.218.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01548
Priority number, dateDE199711146720.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711467
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843111
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970390
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970390
Date:12.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01S15/93
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES SENKRECHTEN ABSTANDES ZWISCHEN EINEM OBJEKT UND EINER SICH ÖRTLICH VERÄNDERNDEN EINRICHTUNG[2000/02]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE VERTICAL DISTANCE BETWEEN AN OBJECT AND A DEVICE WITH A VARIABLE POSITION[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE L'ECART VERTICAL ENTRE UN OBJET ET UN DISPOSITIF A POSITION VARIABLE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1999National basic fee paid 
02.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
19.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2001Fee for grant paid
07.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9201954  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,3,6 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 22 *;
 [Y]DE3341022  (GROLL HORST, et al) [Y] 1,3,6 * figure 3 * * page 11, line 5 - line 18 * * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 2 *