Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976267

EP0976267 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING LOAD IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / TIKKA, Mauri
Fredrikinkatu 71 A 13
FIN-00100 Helsinki / FI
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Holmström, Stefan Mikael , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Holmström, Stefan Mikael , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98913789.809.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998FI00322
Priority number, dateFI1997000153811.04.1997         Original published format: FI 971538
[2000/05]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847299
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976267
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38, G10L3/02
[2004/44]
Former International [2000/05]H04Q7/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR LASTSTEUERUNG IN EINEM MOBILFUNKSYSTEM[2000/05]
English:METHOD OF CONTROLLING LOAD IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA CHARGE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1998Translation filed 
22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
23.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
08.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XP]EP0831669  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]);
 [Y]EP0709982  (IBM [US]);
 [A]WO9522857  (MOTOROLA INC [US]);
 [A]US5459814  (GUPTA PRABHAT K [US], et al);
 [A]EP0415898  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE])
 [Y]  - 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL ..., Volume 2, May 1994, DAVID M. RODRIGUEZ Ph.D. et al., "Outage Probability in Discontinuous Transmission for Cellular Systems", pages 574, 579.,
 [A]  - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE...., November 1989, (Dallas, Texas), C.B. SOUTHCOTT et al., "Voice Control of the Pan-European Digital Mobile Radio System", pages 1070-1074.,