Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970247

EP0970247 - DETECTION OF DNA DAMAGING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentronix Limited
c/o UVI, The Fairbairn Building, 72 Sackville Street
Manchester M60 1QD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Gentronix Limited
c/o UVI, The Fairbairn Building, 72 Sackville Street
Manchester M60 1QD / GB
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INSTITUTE OF SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 88
Manchester M60 1QD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WALMSLEY, Richard, Maurice
159 Oswald Road Chorlton
Manchester M21 9AZ / GB
02 / HEYER, Wolf, Dietrich University of California
Section of Microbiology 1 Shields Avenue
Davis, CA 95616-8665 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date98913889.627.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998GB00786
Priority number, dateGB1997000641427.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706414
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844149
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970247
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970247
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/81, C07K14/435, C07K14/395, C12N5/12
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:DETEKTION VON DNS-SCHÄDIGENDEN SUBSTANZEN[2000/02]
English:DETECTION OF DNA DAMAGING AGENTS[2000/02]
French:DETECTION DE FACTEURS DE DOMMAGE A L'ADN[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2004Fee for grant paid
18.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04077056.2  / EP1561822
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
PT21.12.2004
LU27.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2007/26]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
LU27.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/17]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/18]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
Former [2005/11]FI21.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9507463  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [DY] 1-38 * page 7, line 5 - line 11 * * page 16, line 16 - line 26 *;
 [Y]WO9417208  (XENOMETRIX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-38 * see the whole document, especially page 28, lines 17-35 and page 34, lines 12-19 *;
 [Y]EP0163491  (BIOTEKNIKA INTERNATIONAL [US]) [Y] 14,17-21 * see the whole document, especially page 7, lines 13-18, page 14, 2nd paragraph and Figures *;
 [Y]  - JAMES C. M. ET AL., "DNA sequence analysis of a 35 kb segment from saccharomyces cerevisiae chromosome VII reveals 19 open reading frames including RAD54, ACE1/CUP2, PMR1, RCK1, AMS1 and CAL1/CDC43.", YEAST, (1995), vol. 11, pages 1413 - 1419, XP002073528 [Y] 4,5,16 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320111409
 [Y]  - PLAUTZ J. D. ET AL., "Green fluorescent protein and its derivatives as versatile markers for gene expression in living Drosophila melanogaster, plant and mammalian cells.", GENE, (1996), vol. 173, pages 83 - 87, XP002073529 [Y] 8 * page 85, column R, paragraph L - page 86, column L, line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00700-8
 [YD]  - CORMACK B. P. ET AL., "Yeast-enhanced green fluorescent protein (yEGFP): a reporter of gene expression in Candida albicans.", MICROBIOLOGY, (199702), vol. 143, pages 303 - 311, XP002073530 [YD] 9,18,21 * column W *
 [DY]  - WACH A. ET AL., "New heterologous modules for classical or PCR-based gene disruptions in Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", YEAST, (1994), vol. 10, pages 1793 - 1808, XP002073531 [DY] 15-21 * see the whole document, especially Figures *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320101310
 [A]  - ELLEDGE S. J. AND DAVIS R. W., "Identification of the DNA damage-responsive element of RNR2 and evidence that four distinct cellular factors bind it.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 5373 - 5386, XP002073532 [A] 6 * see the whole document, especially Figures and Discussion *
 [A]  - COLE G. M. ET AL., "Failure to induce a DNA repair gene, RAD54, in Saccharomyces cerevisiae does not affect DNA repair or recombination phenotypes.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 9, no. 8, pages 3314 - 3322, XP002073533 [A] 4,5,16 * column A *
 [A]  - RUSSEL D. W. ET AL., "Structure of the Saccharomyces cerevisiae HO gene and analysis of its upstream regulatory region.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 4281 - 4294, XP002073534 [A] 14,17,20 * see Fig.3 on page 4284 *
 [A]  - WELCH W.J., "How cells respond to stress.", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (199305), vol. 5, pages 34 - 41, XP002073535 [A] 1-38 * page 41, column L, paragraph L - column M, paragraph L *
 [PX]  - WALMSLEY R. M. ET AL., "Green fluorescent protein as a reporter for the DNA damage-induced gene RAD54 in Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", YEAST, (199712), vol. 13, pages 1535 - 1545, XP002073536 [PX] 1-5,7,8,10,17,19,20,22-25,27 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(199712)13:16<1535::AID-YEA221>3.3.CO;2-U