Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969975

EP0969975 - GLASS TREATMENT PROCESS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Decalite Limited
The Portergate Ecclesall Road
Sheffield S11 8NX / GB
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / PEARSON, David
The Portergate, Ecclesall Road
Sheffield S11 8NX / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Orr, William McLean
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Orr, William McLean
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98913892.027.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998GB00803
Priority number, dateGB1997000642727.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706427
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843832
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969975
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969975
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/17, C03C17/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLAS[2000/02]
English:GLASS TREATMENT PROCESS AND APPARATUS[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE VERRE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2002Fee for grant paid
02.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003  31.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
F. Xaver Leipold GmbH & Co. KG
Österreicher Strasse 7/14
90513 Zirndorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/11]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003  31.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
F. Xaver Leipold GmbH & Co. KG
Österreicher Strasse 7/14
90513 Zirndorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2003/37]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2003   
F. Xaver Leipold GmbH & Co. KG
Österreicher Strasse 7/14
90513 Zirndorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Zech, Stefan M.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
05.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.05.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2006
07.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
27.12.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.01.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/19]
Request for further processing for:05.09.2001Request for further processing filed
05.09.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.09.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2001
Stay/Interruption20.12.2001Stay of proceedings
01.07.2002Resumption of proceedings
[2002/28]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
DK30.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
GB27.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
FR31.03.2006
DE03.10.2006
[2008/15]
Former [2007/29]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
DK30.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
GB27.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
DE03.10.2006
Former [2007/17]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
DK30.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
BE31.03.2006
DE03.10.2006
Former [2005/02]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
Former [2004/39]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
Former [2004/15]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
IE27.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/39]AT30.10.2002
CH30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/37]AT30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/30]NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT30.01.2003
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE30.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0170472  (CAMPBELL PETER LEONARD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,14,16,17 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 22 * * page 18, line 4 - page 19, line 4 * * page 26, line 17 - page 27, line 15 *;
 [PX]US5669951  (EICHHORN KEITH L [US]) [PX] 1-3,14-17,21 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 15 *;
 [X]GB2032417  (WORLD SQUASH & RACQUETBALL) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 44 *;
 [X]US5397410  (HANDLY ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 55 - column 4, line 32 *;
 [A]WO9515267  (STAINED GLASS SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,14 * page 1, line 25 - page 10, line 25 *;
 [A]WO9607551  (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 14 - page 7, line 13 *