blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976772

EP0976772 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYCARBONATE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8587 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8587 / JP
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8587 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HATONO, Kazuki, Teijin Ltd.
Iwakuni Res. Center, 2-1, Hinodecho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-8511 / JP
02 / KANEKO, Hiroaki, Teijin Ltd.
Iwakuni Res. Center, 2-1, Hinodecho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-8511 / JP
03 / SAWAKI, Toru, Teijin Ltd.
Iwakuni Res. Center, 2-1, Hinodecho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-8511 / JP
04 / SASAKI, Katsushi, Teijin Ltd.
Iwakuni Res. Center, 2-1, Hinodecho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-8511 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Hallybone, Huw George, et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/05]Votier, Sidney David, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98914048.816.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998JP01743
Priority number, dateJP1997010151718.04.1997         Original published format: JP 10151797
[2000/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9847938
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976772
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976772
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:C08G64/14, C08G64/30
[2000/05]
CPC:
C08G64/14 (EP,US); C08G64/307 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYCARBONATHARZ[2000/05]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYCARBONATE RESIN[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE RESINE DE POLYCARBONATE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999Translation filed 
07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Search fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
18.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DE17.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]BE16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DE17.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2006/13]BE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DE17.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/30]BE16.06.2004
DE17.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/23]BE16.06.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/14]BE16.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0764673  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,8-14,16 * examples 1-18; claims 1-5 * * page 9, line 6 - page 13, line 4 * [Y] 2-4,6,7,15,17;
 [Y]CA2083326  (KHOURI FARID F [US]) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * example 1; claim 1 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 2 * * page 10, line 5 - line 21 *;
 [Y]EP0738579  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 15 * example 7; claims 1-9 *;
 [DY]JPH06157739  ;
 [Y]JPH0488017
 [DY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 27, Database accession no. 1994-222041, XP002173756 & JPH06157739 A 19940607 (NIPPON GE PLASTICS KK) [DY] 4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 18, Database accession no. 1992-146817, XP002173757 & JPH0488017 A 19920319 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 17 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH0859975  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [Y]JPH0488017  (DAICEL CHEM);
 [A]JPH0260923  (BAYER AG);
 [A]JPS6392643  (DAICEL CHEM)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.