Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978280

EP0978280 - 2-AZABICYCLO COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIHARA, Toshio, Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals
Room 612,Nishinomiya Dormitory 4-15, Maruhashi-cho
Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0831 / JP
02 / TOYODA, Tomohiro, Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals
Room 612,Nishinomiya Dormitory 4-15, Maruhashi-cho
Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0831 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/06]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98914114.821.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998JP01817
Priority number, dateJP1997012328026.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12328097
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848801
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978280
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/435, A61K31/44, A61K31/495, A61K31/505, C07D453/06, C07D471/08, C07D401/04
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:2-AZABICYCLO VERBINDUNGEN[2000/06]
English:2-AZABICYCLO COMPOUNDS[2000/06]
French:COMPOSES 2-AZABICYCLO[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999Translation filed 
09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Search fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.11.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH04295477  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME);
 [X]JPH02111768  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME);
 [A]JPH08502481  ;
 [A]WO9636637  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US], et al)
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Abstract No. 125:196067, C. OSBERT H., "Part I. Total Synthesis of Epibatidine Homologs. Part II. Nitrogen Insertion Reactions of Bridged Bicyclic Ketones: a: Substituted Effects on the Regiochemistry of the Schmidt Reaction of 7-Substituted Bicyclo(2,2,2)Heptan-2-Ones. b: Attempted,