Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972210

EP0972210 - SURVEYING METHOD AND SURVEYING SYSTEM COMPRISING A RADIO NAVIGATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trimble AB
Box 64
182 11 Danderyd / SE
[2002/45]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Spectra Precision AB
Box 64
S-182 11 Danderyd / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ERICSSON, Lars
Ravinvägen 7
S-183 40 Täby / SE
02 / ANDERSSON, Leif
Ellag rdsvägen 43
S-187 45 Täby / SE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Herbjörnsen, Rut
Albihns Stockholm Ab P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/03]Forssell, Gunilla
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98914184.119.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998SE00498
Priority number, dateSE1997000118601.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701186
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844363
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972210
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972210
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/14, G01C15/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERMESSUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM MIT EINER FUNKNAVIGATIONSEINHEIT[2000/03]
English:SURVEYING METHOD AND SURVEYING SYSTEM COMPRISING A RADIO NAVIGATION UNIT[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE RELEVE ET DISPOSITIF DE RELEVE COMPRENANT UNE UNITE DE RADIONAVIGATION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
17.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2003Fee for grant paid
10.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19635591  ;
 [A]US5233357  ;
 [A]US5471218  ;
 [A]EP0481307