Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015125

EP1015125 - A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR HAVING A LIQUID FILLED TRANSMISSION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALFA LAVAL AB
Hans Stahles väg
147 80 Tumba / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Alfa Laval AB
Hans Stahles väg
147 80 Tumba / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HÄLLGREN, Ingvar
Fältvägen 30
S-147 41 Tumba / SE
02 / MARTIN, Hans
St ngholmsbacken 14
S-127 40 Skärholmen / SE
03 / NYSTRÖM, Berndt
mmebergsgatan 20
S-124 70 Bandhagen / SE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98914195.726.03.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998SE00551
Priority number, dateSE1997000122604.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701226
[2000/27]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845048
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015125
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B04B1/20, B04B9/08, B04B11/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:TRENNZENTRIFUGE MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSGEFÜLLTER GETRIEBEKAMMER[2000/27]
English:A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR HAVING A LIQUID FILLED TRANSMISSION CHAMBER[2000/27]
French:SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE AYANT UNE CHAMBRE DE TRANSMISSION REMPLIE DE LIQUIDE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999Translation filed 
23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
02.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
22.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US3685721  (KOHAMA MASHIRO)