Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993303

EP0993303 - SUBSTANCES IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE PREFERENCE AND CREATE ACCEPTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uvnäs-Moberg, Kerstin
Sveavägen 9D
182 62 Djursholm / SE
For all designated states
Lundeberg, Thomas
Höjdstigen 7
181 31 Lidingö / SE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Berg, Sven Anders , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Berg, Sven Anders , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98914197.326.03.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998SE00560
Priority number, dateSE1997000118401.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701184
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843662
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993303
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993303
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/11, // A61K7/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:WIRKSTOFFE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON VORZUG UND ANNAHME[2000/16]
English:SUBSTANCES IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE PREFERENCE AND CREATE ACCEPTANCE[2000/16]
French:SUBSTANCES DESTINEES A CREER PREFERENCE ET ACCEPTANCE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/42]
28.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.05.2003
IT21.05.2003
NL21.05.2003
DK21.08.2003
GR21.08.2003
PT21.08.2003
SE21.08.2003
ES01.09.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2004/23]FI21.05.2003
NL21.05.2003
DK21.08.2003
GR21.08.2003
PT21.08.2003
SE21.08.2003
ES01.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI21.05.2003
NL21.05.2003
GR21.08.2003
PT21.08.2003
SE21.08.2003
ES01.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL21.05.2003
GR21.08.2003
PT21.08.2003
SE21.08.2003
ES01.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL21.05.2003
GR21.08.2003
PT21.08.2003
SE21.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE21.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]  - BEHAVIORAL AND NEURAL BIOLOGY, Volume 59, 1993, PIOTR POPIK et al., "Social Transmission of Flavored Tea Preferences: Facilitation by a Vasopressin Analog and Oxytocin", pages 63-68.,
ExaminationWO9843660
 WO9843661