Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971816

EP0971816 - A PACKAGING LAMINATE INCLUDING A MOISTURE-SENSITIVE GAS BARRIER LAYER, A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE PACKAGING LAMINATE, AS WELL AS PACKAGING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A.
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BENTMAR, Mats
Hästhovsgatan 8
S-233 37 Svedala / SE
02 / BERLIN, Mikael
Fjelievägen 13B, 4 tr.
S-227 36 Lund / SE
03 / LETH, Ib
Anna Hökares väg 7
S-273 64 Kävlinge / SE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Forsberg, Lars-Ake
AB Tetra Pak
Patent Department
Ruben Rausings gata
221 86 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Forsberg, Lars-Ake
AB Tetra Pak, Patent Department, Ruben Rausings gata
221 86 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date98914211.201.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998SE00606
Priority number, dateSE1997000126004.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701260
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845111
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971816
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971816
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B32B3/02, B32B27/08, B65D5/42, B65D65/40
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNGSLAMINAT MIT EINER FEUCHTIGKEITSEMPFINDLICHEN GASSPERRSCHICHT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTER[2000/03]
English:A PACKAGING LAMINATE INCLUDING A MOISTURE-SENSITIVE GAS BARRIER LAYER, A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE PACKAGING LAMINATE, AS WELL AS PACKAGING CONTAINERS[2000/03]
French:LAMINE D'EMBALLAGE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE BARRIERE DE GAZ SENSIBLE A L'HUMIDITE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE LAMINE D'EMBALLAGE ET CONTENANTS D'EMBALLAGE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
04.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2004Fee for grant paid
01.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US5552002  (FARRELL ROBERT A [US], et al);
 [A]US4525134  (MCHENRY ROBERT J [US], et al);
 [A]EP0684184  (TETRA PAK JAPAN [JP]);
 [A]DE3011630  (RISSEN GMBH MASCHF [DE]);
 [A]DE2752647  (HENKEL KGAA)