Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972218

EP0972218 - SNAP-IN PROXIMAL CONNECTOR FOR MOUNTING AN OPTIC FIBER ELEMENT INTO A LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COGENT LIGHT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
26145 West Technology Drive
Santa Clarita, CA 91355-1137 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / ROLLER, Thomas, W.
15784 Milne Court
Moorpark, CA 93021 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Kaminski, Susanne , et al
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Kaminski, Susanne , et al
Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79
9490 Vaduz / LI
Former [2002/29]Kaminski, Susanne , et al
Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Austrasse 79
9490 Vaduz / LI
Former [2000/03]Kaminski, Susanne, Dr.
Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est., Letzanaweg 25-27
9495 Triesen / LI
Application number, filing date98914378.931.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US06364
Priority number, dateUS1997083135101.04.1997         Original published format: US 831351
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844371
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972218
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972218
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42, G02B6/38
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:PROXIMALER SCHNUPPVERBINDUNGSSTECKER ZUM MONTIEREN EINES FASEROPTISCHEN ELEMENTS IN EIN LICHTQUELLENSYSTEM[2000/03]
English:SNAP-IN PROXIMAL CONNECTOR FOR MOUNTING AN OPTIC FIBER ELEMENT INTO A LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM[2000/03]
French:CONNECTEUR PROXIMAL A ENCLENCHEMENT POUR MONTER UN ELEMENT DE FIBRE OPTIQUE DANS UN SYSTEME DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
09.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2001Fee for grant paid
31.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9704341  (COGENT LIGHT TECH [US]) [A] 1,3-5,11-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3948582  (MARTIN DAVID JOSEPH) [A] 1,5,6,10 * column W *;
 [A]EP0519219  (STRATOS CONNECTORS AB [SE]) [A] 1,5,6,10 * column 3, line 6 - line 58 * * column 4 - column 7 * * column 8, line 1 - line 36; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5142600  (ORTIZ JR ANGEL L [US]) [A] 1,4,6,9,10 * column W *;
 [A]EP0156361  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,3,5,6,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4824202  (AURAS ALAIN G [US]) [A] 1,4,6,9 * column W *;
 [A]US4883333  (YANEZ SERGE J [US]) [A] 1,3-5,11-16 * column W *