Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975375

EP0975375 - SEALING AND VENTING SYSTEM FOR OXIDATIVE DISINFECTION OF CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester
New York 14604-2701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place
Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DeMEO, Gaetano
Via Palestro, 3
I-22050 Lomagna / IT
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Bowman, Paul Alan , et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98914456.302.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US06565
Priority number, dateUS19970041993P16.04.1997         Original published format: US 41993 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846278
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975375
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975375
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/18
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERRIEGELUNGS- UND BELÜFTUNGSSYSTEM ZUM OXIDATIVEN DESINFIZIEREN VON KONTAKTLINSEN[2000/05]
English:SEALING AND VENTING SYSTEM FOR OXIDATIVE DISINFECTION OF CONTACT LENSES[2000/05]
French:SYSTEME DE FERMETURE ET D'AERATION POUR LA DESINFECTION PAR OXYDATION DES LENTILLES DE CONTACT[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
29.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2003Fee for grant paid
30.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0715858  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16,18 * column 4, line 11 - line 46 * * figures 1,3 * * claims 1,2,16,17,19,25 *;
 [Y]WO9210110  (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16,18 * page 15, line 3 - line 10 * * figure 11 * * claims 2-4 *