Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977536

EP0977536 - ACOUSTIC RESPIRATORY THERAPY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hughes, Arthur R.
2736 S. Uravan Street
Aurora, CO 80013 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Vidon, Patrice , et al
Cabinet Vidon
Technopole Atalante
16B Rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Vidon, Patrice , et al
Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes
35700 Rennes / FR
Application number, filing date98914508.106.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US06739
Priority number, dateUS1997084374521.04.1997         Original published format: US 843745
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847463
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977536
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977536
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Search report(s)International search reportUS29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61H31/00, A61M15/00, A61M16/00, A63B23/18
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ATEMTHERAPIE[2000/06]
English:ACOUSTIC RESPIRATORY THERAPY APPARATUS[2000/06]
French:APPAREIL ACOUSTIQUE DE THERAPIE RESPIRATOIRE[2004/16]
Former [2000/06]APPAREIL DE THERAPIE RESPIRATOIRE SONORE
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Search fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
16.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2004Fee for grant paid
21.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4805612  (JENSEN ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 12, line 17 - line 18; figure 1 * * column 5, line 7 - line 40 * * column 16, line 4 - line 18 * * claim 8 *;
 [A]WO9324093  (CREATIVESCO OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5569170  (HANSEN CRAIG N [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2918917  (EMERSON JOHN H);
 [A]US3628280  (NAVE RICHARD L);
 [A]US4054134  (KRITZER RICHARD W);
 [A]US4221381  (ERICSON RICHARD E)