Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975992

EP0975992 - Pressure impulse telemetry apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]PRESSURE IMPULSE TELEMETRY APPARATUS AND METHOD
[2004/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
2601 Beltline Road
Carrollton, TX 75006-5401 / US
[2006/32]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
2601 Beltline Road
Carrollton, TX 75006-5401 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Carstensen, Kenneth J.
Apt. 211, 1860 Whiteoak Drive
Houston, TX 77009 / US
For all designated states
Skinner, Neal G.
1219 Indian Paint
Lewisville, TX 75076 / US
For all designated states
Pool, Charles M.
3832 Ashbury Lane
Bedford, TX 76021 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CARSTENSEN, Kenneth J.
Apt. 211 1860 Whiteoak Drive
Houston, TX 77009 / US
02 / SKINNER, Neal G.
1219 Indian Paint
Lewisville, TX 75076 / US
03 / POOL, Charles M.
3832 Ashbury Lane
Bedford, TX 76021 / US
 [2001/17]
Former [2000/05]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2001/17](deleted)
...
Former [2000/05]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914537.007.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US06815
Priority number, dateUS19970042783P07.04.1997         Original published format: US 42783 P
US1998005605306.04.1998         Original published format: US 56053
[2006/32]
Former [2000/05]US19970004278P07.04.1997
US1998005605306.04.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845732
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975992
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975992
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01V3/00, H04H9/00, E21B47/18, G01V11/00
[2003/15]
Former International [2000/05]G01V3/00, H04H9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durckimpulsbetätigte Telemetrie[2004/21]
English:Pressure impulse telemetry apparatus and method[2004/22]
French:Appareil et procédé de télémetrie par impulsions de pression[2004/22]
Former [2000/05]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRUCKIMPULSBETÄTIGTE TELEMETRIE
Former [2000/05]PRESSURE IMPULSE TELEMETRY APPARATUS AND METHOD
Former [2000/05]APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR TELEMESURE EN PRESSION PAR IMPULSIONS AU COUP DE BELIER
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Search fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.01.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/41]
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/50]
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
10.10.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1999/50]
21.06.2006Fee for grant paid
21.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Request for further processing for:27.06.2006Request for further processing filed
21.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.07.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.08.2006
DK09.11.2006
DE10.11.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/16]DK09.11.2006
DE10.11.2006
Former [2007/22]DK09.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US5579283  (OWENS STEVE C [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * column 4, line 53 - line 65 * * column 8 - column 9 * * column 13 - column 16 * * figures 1-27 *;
 [PX]US5691712  (MEEK DALE E [US], et al) [PX] 1-44 * column 2 - column 4 * * column 6 - column 9 * * figures 1-31 *;
 [A]EP0309030  (ANADRILL INT SA [PA]) [A] 1-44 * column 7, line 12 - column 10, line 30 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US4412130  (WINTERS WARREN J [US]) [A] 4,14 * column 3 - column 5 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[XP]US5691712  (MEEK DALE E [US], et al);
 [X]US5579283  (OWENS STEVE C [US], et al);
 [Y]US4412130  (WINTERS WARREN J [US])