blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973602

EP0973602 - MEMBRANE APPARATUS WITH ENHANCED MASS TRANSFER VIA ACTIVE MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
5th Avenue and Bigelow Boulevard
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
[2005/34]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
5th Avenue and Bigelow Boulevard
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOROVETZ, Harvey, S.
1194 Driftwood Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15243 / US
02 / LITWAK, Philip
100 Denniston Avenue 7
Pittsburgh, PA 15206 / US
03 / GARTNER, Mark
336 Sarah Street
McKees Rocks, PA 15136 / US
04 / REEDER, Gary, D.
4650 Siloam Road
Beulah, CO 81023 / US
05 / SAWZIK, Patricia
310 Denniston Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15206 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2009/49]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Former [2005/30]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2000/04]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date98914594.107.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06965
Priority number, dateUS1997083704811.04.1997         Original published format: US 837048
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846339
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973602
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973602
Date:24.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B01D63/16, B01D63/02, A61M1/18, A61M1/26
[2000/04]
CPC:
B01D63/02 (EP); B01F27/271 (EP,US); A61M1/262 (EP,US);
B01D63/043 (EP,US); B01D63/16 (EP,US); B01D65/08 (EP,US);
A61M1/1698 (EP,US); A61M2206/14 (EP,US); B01D2313/20 (EP);
B01D2313/2061 (US); B01D2321/2041 (EP,US); B01D2321/2083 (EP,US);
Y10S261/28 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:MEMBRANVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEM STOFFAUSTAUSCH DURCH AKTIVES MISCHEN[2000/04]
English:MEMBRANE APPARATUS WITH ENHANCED MASS TRANSFER VIA ACTIVE MIXING[2000/04]
French:APPAREIL A MEMBRANE PERMETTANT UN TRANSFERT DE MASSE ACCRU GRACE A UN MELANGE ACTIF[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
22.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2005Fee for grant paid
26.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200407   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2004
30.04.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2005
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
CY24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
FR24.08.2005
IT24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
IE07.04.2006
LU07.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/36]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
IT24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
IE07.04.2006
LU07.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2008/16]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
IT24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
IE07.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/17]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
IE07.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/07]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2006/36]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
DE25.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/26]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT24.08.2005
CH24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
LI24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT24.08.2005
FI24.08.2005
SE24.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DA]US3674440  (KITRILAKIS SOTIRIS S) [DA] 1,2* the whole document *;
 [A]US4212741  (BRUMFIELD ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0140315  (AZZOLINI GRAZIANO) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [XA]WO9403266  (MALONEY JAMES V JR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 13 * * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 17 * * page 15, line 6 - page 16, line 37 * [A] 13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.