Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974213

EP0974213 - N x M OPTICAL WAVELENGTH ROUTING SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chorum Technologies, Inc.
Suite 200, 1155 East Collins Boulevard
Richardson, TX 75081 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Kuang-Yi
1112 lakeridge Drive
Plano, Texas 75075 / US
02 / LIU, Jian-Yu
2721 Woods Lane
Garland, Texas 75044 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre , et al
Baker Botts 41 Lothbury
London EC2R 7HF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre , et al
Baker Botts 99 Gresham Street
London EC2V 7BA / GB
Former [2000/04]Knott, Stephen Gilbert , et al
MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date98914607.107.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06982
Priority number, dateUS19970043012P15.04.1997         Original published format: US 43012 P
US1998003793710.03.1998         Original published format: US 37937
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847254
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974213
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04J14/00, H04B10/00, H04Q11/00, G02F1/31, G02B6/34, H04J14/02
[2000/27]
Former International [2000/04]H04J14/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:N X M OPTISCHER WELLENLÄNGEN WEGELEITER[2000/04]
English:N x M OPTICAL WAVELENGTH ROUTING SWITCH[2000/04]
French:SELECTEUR D'ACHEMINEMENT A LONGUEUR D'ONDE OPTIQUE N x M[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Search fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/20]
06.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5694233  (WU KUANG-YI [US], et al) [PX] 1-19 * column 2, line 1 - line 14 * * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 36; figures 2A,2B,3A,3B *;
 [A]WO9709536  (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [A] 1,3-7,9,11-15,17-19 * page 5, line 10 - line 14 * * page 7, line 20 - page 12, line 19; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0307244  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,3-7,9,11-15,17-19 * column 1, line 14 - line 32 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4461543  (MCMAHON DONALD H [US]) [A] 1,3-7,9,11-15,17-19 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 31 * * column 6, line 26 - column 8, line 54; figures 5A,5B,5C,6A,6B,6C,7A,7B,7C,8A,8B *;
 [A]EP0370410  (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8-10,16-19 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 20; figures 3A,3B,3C,4A,4B,4C *
International search[A]US5194977  (NISHIO MAKOTO [JP]);
 [A]US5414540  (PATEL JAYANTILAL S [US], et al)