Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0973820
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.03.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
03.12.2004 |
First examination report |
|
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.02.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
04.02.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
11.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
11.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
17.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|