Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973820

EP0973820 - METHOD OF MAKING POLYCARBONATE PREPOLYMER AND METHOD OF MAKING HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYCARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ORMAND, Michael, G.
9960 E.Victoria Lane
Tucson, Arizona 85730 / US
02 / MUNJAL, Sarat
Marperger Strasse 18A
04229 Leipzig / DE
[2000/15]
Former [2000/12]01 / ORMAND, Michael, G.
117 Bois D'Arc
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
02 / MUNJAL, Sarat
Marperger Strasse 18A
04229 Leipzig / DE
Former [2000/04]01 / ORMAND, Michael, G.
117 Bois D'Arc
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
02 / MUNJAL, Sarat
104 Mango
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914609.707.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06987
Priority number, dateUS1997082394908.04.1997         Original published format: US 823949
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845351
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973820
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08G64/30, C08G64/42, C08G64/20, C08G64/18, C08G64/14
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYCARBONATPREPOLYMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYKARBONAT MIT HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT[2000/04]
English:METHOD OF MAKING POLYCARBONATE PREPOLYMER AND METHOD OF MAKING HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYCARBONATE[2000/04]
French:TECHNIQUE DE PRODUCTION DE PREPOLYMERE DE POLYCARBONATE ET DE POLYCARBONATE DE MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
02.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
03.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9708227  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO.) [X] 1-16;
 [X]EP0848030  [X] 1-16 * page 3, lines 20-30 * * page 4, lines 20-35; claims 1,2 *;
 [DA]EP0338085  (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KABUSHIKI) [DA] 1-16;
 [X]WO9007536  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 28-37 * claim 44 *;
 [X]EP0568740  (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES) [X] 17-28 * column 5, line 18 - line 21; example ALL *