Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977773

EP0977773 - SELECTIVE FACTOR Xa INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COR THERAPEUTICS, INC.
256 East Grand Avenue, Suite 80
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SU, Ting
3222 Upper Lock Avenue
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
02 / ZHU, Bing-Yan
3225 Adelaide Way
Balmont, CA94002-1223 / US
03 / SCARBOROUGH, Robert, M.
2544 Belmont Canyon Road
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
[2000/15]
Former [2000/06]01 / SU, Ting
3222 Upper Lock Avenue
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
02 / ZHU, Bing-Yan
Apartment K302 1125 Balclutha Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
03 / SCARBOROUGH, Robert, M.
2544 Belmont Canyon Road
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie , et al
Cabinet ORES 36 Rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Goulard, Sophie , et al
Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
Former [2000/06]Mouget-Goniot, Claire , et al
Cabinet Orès, 6, Avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98914658.413.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US07160
Priority number, dateUS19970072094P14.04.1997         Original published format: US 72094 P
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846627
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977773
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07K5/06, A61K38/05
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE FAKTOR XA-INHIBITOREN[2000/06]
English:SELECTIVE FACTOR Xa INHIBITORS[2000/06]
French:INHIBITEURS SELECTIFS DU FACTEUR Xa[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase12.10.1999National basic fee paid 
12.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
26.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
02.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9309133  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5 * whole document, esp. examples, claims, page 24, line 20 to page 25, line 15 *;
 [Y]WO9640744  (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * whole document, esp. page 29, lines 17-20, examples 14,15, abstract *;
 [A]WO9535313  (CORVAS INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * whole document, especially examples and pages 86/87 *;
 [A]WO9619491  (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA], et al) [A] 1-5 * whole document *;
 [PX]WO9809987  (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA], et al) [PX] 1-5 * examples *
 [A]  - KUNITADA S ET AL, "FACTOR XA INHIBITORS", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (199610), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 531 - 542, XP002057653 [A] * whole content, esp. tables 8 to 10 *
 [A]  - STILZ H U ET AL, "DISCOVERY OF AN ORALLY ACTIVE NON-PEPTIDE FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19960524), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 2118 - 2122, XP000578006 [A] * whole document, Tables *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960210f