Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976302

EP0976302 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF PROGRAMMING A DIGITAL HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSPFactory Ltd.
611 Kumpf Drive, Unit 200 Waterloo
Ontario N2V 1K8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
DSPFactory Ltd.
611 Kumpf Drive, Unit 200
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 1K8 / CA
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
DSPFactory Ltd.
Suite 206, 80 King Street South
Waterloo, Ontario N2J 1P5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Anthony, Todd
468 Stillmeadow Circle
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 5M3 / CA
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98914755.816.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998CA00330
Priority number, dateUS19970041975P16.04.1997         Original published format: US 41975 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847314
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976302
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976302
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)International search reportEP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROGRAMMIERUNG EINES HÖRHILFEGERÄTES[2000/05]
English:APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF PROGRAMMING A DIGITAL HEARING AID[2000/05]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE SERVANT A PROGRAMMER UNE PROTHESE AUDITIVE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1999National basic fee paid 
11.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
14.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2004Fee for grant paid
18.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
IT15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY16.04.2005
LU16.04.2005
IE18.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
PT15.05.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/29]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY16.04.2005
LU16.04.2005
IE18.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/26]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY16.04.2005
LU16.04.2005
IE18.04.2005
Former [2007/21]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY16.04.2005
IE18.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/17]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
IE18.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2006/25]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
IE18.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI15.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5083312  (NEWTON JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,14,15 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 43 * [A] 17;
 [X]DE4419901  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,14 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 30; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4790019  (HUEBER FRITZ [AT]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 15 *;
 [A]US5172346  (WAGNER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 37 - line 63 *;
 [A]US4918736  (BORDEWIJK LOURENS G [NL]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 11 *;
 [A]CH671131  (ASCOM AUDIOSYS AG) [A] 1,6 * page 1, column L, line 35 - page 3, column L, line 5 *;
 [A]US5226086  (PLATT JONATHAN C [US]) [A] 7,8 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 51 *