blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0972321 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0972321



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 80
16.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.04.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 1
20.12.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
30.07.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
23.07.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.06.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.06.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
04.01.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.11.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.10.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
21.09.2000 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Description Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
27.01.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 16
01.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
01.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14