blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0972321


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.04.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.06.2002  [2002/23]
17.12.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
25.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
25.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.06.2001 First examination report
05.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant
01.03.2001 Renewal fee
05.01.2001 Change - representative published on  21.02.2001 [2001/08]
21.10.2000 Change - applicant published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
21.10.2000 Change - representative published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
29.09.2000 Change - representative published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
22.03.2000 Renewal fee
03.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
03.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
04.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication