blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0972321
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001517358Global Dossier 02.10.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19713661 02.04.1997
DE9800634 03.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0972321Global Dossier 19.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19713661 02.04.1997
DE9800634 03.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6196852 06.03.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19713661 02.04.1997
DE9800634 03.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9844599Global Dossier 08.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19713661 02.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19713661 24.09.1998C1
Priority number Date
DE19713661 02.04.1997