Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972321

EP0972321 - CONTACT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
81739 München / DE
[2000/49]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NEUMANN, Gerd
Scharmeder Strasse 99
D-33106 Paderborn / DE
02 / THOENE, Hans-Jürgen
Friedrich von Spee Strasse 32
D-33098 Paderborn / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Epping, Wilhelm , et al
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26
80034 München / DE
Former [2000/49]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. , et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26
80034 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98914833.303.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998DE00634
Priority number, dateDE199711366102.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713661
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844599
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972321
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01R23/72, H01R9/09, H05K7/10
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:KONTAKTANORDNUNG[2000/03]
English:CONTACT ARRANGEMENT[2000/03]
French:SYSTEME DE CONTACTS[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/23]
20.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5462440  (ROTHENBERGER RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-4,7 * column 5, line 33 - line 42 * * column 6, line 9 - line 17; figures 1-4,8 *;
 [A]WO9534106  (TESSERA INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 23, line 26 - page 25, line 20 * * page 42, line 34 - page 45, line 21; figures 1-6,14-17 *;
 [A]US5184962  (NOSCHESE ROCCO J [US]) [A] 1,2,4,7 * column 3, line 35 - line 67; figures 1-5 *