Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971916

EP0971916 - N-(ARGINYL)BENZENESULPHONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF AS ANTITHROMBOTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI-SYNTHELABO
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Sanofi-Synthélabo
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ALTENBURGER, Jean-Michel
2, rue du Parc
F-92190 Meudon / FR
02 / LASSALLE, Gilbert
15, rue de la Croix Valentin
F-91470 Les Molières / FR
03 / GALTIER, Daniel
16, rue Francis Poulenc
F-78280 Guyancourt / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth , et al
Sanofi
Département Brevets
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth , et al
Sanofi-Synthélabo Service Brevets 174, avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98914932.317.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998FR00532
Priority number, dateFR1997000339220.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9703392
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842700
Date:01.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971916
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D409/12, C07D295/185, C07D401/12, C07D213/40, C07D333/20, C07D211/18, C07D211/70, A61K31/435
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:N-(ARGINYL)BENZENSULFONAMIDDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTITHROMBOTISCHE MITTEL[2000/03]
English:N-(ARGINYL)BENZENESULPHONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF AS ANTITHROMBOTIC AGENTS[2000/03]
French:DERIVES DE N-(ARGINYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTITHROMBOTIQUES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
07.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DY]FR2735469  (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [DY] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2801478  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * voir le document en entier, en particulier exemple 47 *;
 [A]WO9629327  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - R. KIKUMOTO ET AL., "Selective inhibition of thrombin by (2R,4R)-4-methyl- 1-[N2-[(3-methyl-1,2,3,4-tetrahydro- 8-quinolinyl)sulfonyl]-L-arginyl]- 2-piperidinecarboxylic acid", BIOCHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19840103), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 85 - 90, XP002049060 [Y] 1-13 * voir le document en entier, en particulier page 87, figure 1, composés MPQ e QP, page 88, tableau III, et page 89, colonne de gauche, lignes 11-34 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00296a014