Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972220

EP0972220 - MICROSCOPY IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.06.2003  [2003/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED
2 South Parks Road
Oxford OX1 3UB / GB
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WILSON, Tony
18 Jeune Street
Oxford OX4 1BN / GB
02 / NEIL, Mark, Andrew, Aquilla
22 Poplar Road, Botley
Oxford OX2 9LB / GB
03 / JUSKAITIS, Rimvydas
3 Marriott Close
Oxford OX2 8NT / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Schlich, George
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Schlich, George William
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98914965.303.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998GB00988
Priority number, dateGB1997000684304.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9706843
GB1997002648515.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726485
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845745
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972220
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972220
Date:14.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00, G06T5/50, G01B11/24
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/36]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ABBILDUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR MIKROSKOPIE[2000/03]
English:MICROSCOPY IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHOD[2000/03]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE EN MICROSCOPIE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
23.09.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
03.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2001Fee for grant paid
13.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:AVIMO EUROPE LIMITED
Moorfields, Lisieux Way, Taunton
Somerset TA1 JZ / GB
Date:30.07.2001
[2001/39]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
MC03.04.2002
[2003/25]
Former [2002/49]FI14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
Former [2002/48]FI14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
Former [2002/33]FI14.11.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9706509  (GIM SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,10,17-20,27-33 * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line L * * page 9, line 21 - page 11, line L; figure 2 * * page 13, line 15 - page 16, line L *;
 [DA]US5381236  (MORGAN COLIN G [GB]) [DA] 1,3-5,10,11,14-17,19-21,27,28,30,31,33 * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 12 * * column 9, line 6 - line 17 * * column 10, line 33 - line 48; figures 8A,B *;
 [A]US5513275  (KHALAJ BABAK H [US], et al) [A] 15 * column 6, line 14 - line 23 * * column 7, line 8 - line 9; figures 1,5 *
 [X]  - GRUBER M ET AL, "SIMPLE, ROBUST AND ACCURATE PHASE-MEASURING TRIANGULATION", OPTIK, (19920101), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 118 - 122, XP000247177 [X] 15 * page 121, column L, paragraph 3; figures 6,8 * * page 122, column L *