Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975946

EP0975946 - AUTOMATED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVALUATING THE PERFORMANCE CHARACTERISTICS OF ENDOSCOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2001 [2001/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARTFORD HOSPITAL
80 Seymour Street, P.O. Box 5037
Hartford, CT 06103-5037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Hartford Hospital
80 Seymour Street, P.O. Box 5037
Hartford, CT 06103-5037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSOW, Eric
16 Stillbrook Road
Avon, CT 06001 / US
02 / ADAM, Joseph
36 Cambridge Street
West Hartford, CT 06110 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Menges, Rolf
Ackmann Menges
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Erhardtstrasse 12
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Erhardtstrasse 12
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98915146.920.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US05575
Priority number, dateUS1997082228320.03.1997         Original published format: US 822283
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841836
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975946
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01M11/00, G02B23/26, A61B1/00
[2001/05]
Former International [2000/05]G01M11/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERTUNG DER BETRIEBSPARAMETER VON ENDOSKOPEN[2000/05]
English:AUTOMATED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVALUATING THE PERFORMANCE CHARACTERISTICS OF ENDOSCOPES[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF AUTOMATISES SERVANT A EVALUER LES CARACTERISTIQUES D'EFFICACITE D'ENDOSCOPES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Search fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
17.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
16.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9707627  (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14,17-20 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 6 - page 16, paragraph 1; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5430475  (GOTO MASAHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1,9-12,19,21 * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 13; figure 17; claim 1 *;
 [X]US5115126  (AMS FELIX [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,19,20 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 31 * * abstract *;
 [A]DD255991  (BERLIN MED GERAETE [DD]) [A] 1,2,9,13,19,20 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4543477  (DOI YUZURU [JP], et al);
 [X]US4613232  (DIENER JOERG [DE], et al)