Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1014911

EP1014911 - LOCKING-CYLINDER SUPPORTED SURGICAL BOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The OR Group, Inc.
531 Main Street
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
[2000/45]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Allen Medical Systems
15627 Neo Parkway
Garfield Heights, OH 44128 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAVARRO, Richard
10350 Forestview Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
02 / KESELMAN, Yury
24001 East Baintree Road
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2000/27]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98915250.902.04.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US06573
Priority number, dateUS1997004337704.04.1997         Original published format: US 43377
US1998005216831.03.1998         Original published format: US 52168
US1998005333201.04.1998         Original published format: US 53332
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844890
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1014911
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1014911
Date:02.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61G13/12
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:MIT VERRIEGELUNGSZYLINDER GESTÜTZTE CHIRURGISCHE FUSSAUFLAGE[2004/25]
English:LOCKING-CYLINDER SUPPORTED SURGICAL BOOT[2000/27]
French:REPOSE-PIED CHIRURGICAL SUPPORTE PAR UN CYLINDRE DE BLOCAGE[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]MIT VERRIEGELUNGSZYLINDER GESTÜTZTE FUSSAUFLAGE
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2004Fee for grant paid
23.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
IT02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU02.04.2005
IE04.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
PT02.07.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/29]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU02.04.2005
IE04.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2007/26]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
LU02.04.2005
IE04.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2007/21]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
CY02.04.2005
IE04.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2007/17]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
IE04.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/25]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
IE04.04.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/22]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
NL02.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/14]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/12]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2005/51]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
SE02.05.2005
Former [2005/48]FI02.02.2005
SE02.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI02.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[AD]US5560577  (KESELMAN YURY [US]) [AD] 1,13,20,21,37,46-48 * the whole document *
Examination US3206188
  US4323060
  DE2819866
by applicantUS385040
 US4564164
 US5116008
 US4577730
 US5560577