Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989958

EP0989958 - NITRATE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
Business and Patent Law
Mail Stop D412
Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
The Regents of The University of California
Business and Patent Law, Mail Stop D412
Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DZIEWINSKI, Jacek, J.
79 Mesa Verde
Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US
02 / MARCZAK, Stanislaw
Apartment 65 3000 Trinity Drive
Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98915297.003.04.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US06755
Priority number, dateUS19970044099P23.04.1997         Original published format: US 44099 P
US1997085723216.05.1997         Original published format: US 857232
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847818
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989958
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989958
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/46, C02F1/461, B01D53/34
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:REDUKTION VON NITRATEN[2000/14]
English:NITRATE REDUCTION[2000/14]
French:REDUCTION DE NITRATES[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Search fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
[2004/29]
Former [2004/22]CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
Former [2004/14]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPS5367678  (EBARA MFG, et al);
 [Y]US4990266  (VORLOP KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al);
 [Y]US5376240  (KACZUR JERRY J [US], et al)