Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973598

EP0973598 - AIR CLEANER HAVING FILTER ELEMENT INTEGRALLY FORMED WITH HOUSING END CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR-MAZE CORPORATION
115 East Steels Corners Road, P.O. Box 1459
Stow, OH 44224-0459 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / GIELINK, Robert, J.
7358 Center Street
Mentor, OH 44060 / US
02 / ALBERS, Michael, D.
20996 Detroit Road nr. 9
Rocky River, OH 44116 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Butcher, Ian James , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Butcher, Ian James , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98915325.907.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06849
Priority number, dateUS1997083840507.04.1997         Original published format: US 838405
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845024
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973598
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01D46/24, F02M35/024
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:LUFTREINIGER MIT DER GEHÄUSE-ENDKAPPE INTEGRAL GEFORMTEM FILTERELEMENT[2000/04]
English:AIR CLEANER HAVING FILTER ELEMENT INTEGRALLY FORMED WITH HOUSING END CAP[2000/04]
French:EPURATEUR D'AIR A FILTRE INTEGRE DANS L'OBTURATEUR D'EXTREMITE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
01.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
06.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.12.1999M01   Fee paid on   05.01.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XAY]GB2056307  (ENGINEERING COMPONENTS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,8,13,14,16 * figure - * [A] 3,9,10,15,19,26 [Y] 1,2,4-8,11-14,16-18,20-25;
 [Y]WO9702084  (AIR MAZE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,11-14,16-18,20-25 * the whole document *