EP0983121 - NON-METALLIC SPRAY NOZZLE MANIFOLD AND SUPPORT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO. North Avenue at Schmale Road, P.O. Box 7900 Wheaton Illinois 60189-7900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO. North Avenue at Schmale Road, P.O. Box 7900 Wheaton, Illinois 60189-7900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIF, Stephen, C. 29 W. 303 Mark Drive Naperville, IL 60564 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98915391.1 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US07043 | Priority number, date | US19970844301 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: US 844301 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847624 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983121 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/00, B05B1/20 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B05B1/202 (EP,US);
A01M7/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | B05B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/10] | Title | German: | NICHT METALLISCHER VERTEILER FÜR SPRÜHDÜSER UND HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIESEN VERTEILER | [2000/10] | English: | NON-METALLIC SPRAY NOZZLE MANIFOLD AND SUPPORT THEREFOR | [2000/10] | French: | RAMPE DE DISTRIBUTION NON METALLIQUE A BUSES DE PULVERISATION ET SUPPORT CORRESPONDANT | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 30.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1084256 (MONTMANEIX, ROBERT) [X] 1-3,9-12,17,20 * page 2, column L, line 13 - page 2, column R, line 38; figures 2,4,5 *; | [X]US3091401 (HRUBY JR JOHN O) [X] 1,2,8-11,17,23,24 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 14; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4273286 (MENZEL STANLEY W O) [A] 1,11,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5230302 (STEUDLER JR FREDERICK W [US]) [A] 15 * the whole document *; | [T]WO9956891 (EAGLE PICHER IND INC [US]) [T] 1-24* page 5, line 2 - page 7, line 14; figures 2,4 * | International search | [X]US5097798 (LITTLE LARRY L [US]); | [YP]US5651502 (EDWARDS TIM L [US]) |