Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007973

EP1007973 - MICROVOLUME LIQUID HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Packard Instrument Company, Inc.
2200 Warrenville Road
Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / PELC, Richard, E.
1420 Juliet Lane
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
02 / CHIBUCOS, Nicholas, S.
280 Biscayne Street
Bloomingdale, IL 60108 / US
03 / PAPEN, Roeland, F.
1465 Jasper Drive
Wheaton, IL 60187 / US
04 / MAYER, Wilhelm
Waldstrasse 1a
D-21255 Tostedt / DE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/24]Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98915459.608.04.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US07193
Priority number, dateUS19970041861P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 41861 P
US19970067665P05.12.1997         Original published format: US 67665 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9845205
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1007973
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007973
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/10, B01L3/02
[2000/25]
Former International [2000/24]G01N35/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/24]
TitleGerman:MIKROVOLUMENFLUESSIGKEITSHANDHABUNGSSYSTEM[2000/24]
English:MICROVOLUME LIQUID HANDLING SYSTEM[2000/24]
French:SYSTEME POUR LA MANIPULATION DE MICROVOLUMES DE LIQUIDES[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Search fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
31.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2004Fee for grant paid
02.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04028043.0  / EP1512975
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
IT01.12.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/51]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
Former [2005/36]AT01.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0747689  (MEDICAL LABORATORY AUTOMATION [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 27 * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 58 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 18;
 [YX]EP0268237  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 4,5,8,10,14,15,17-20 * page 2, line 6 - page 2, line 21 * * page 3, line 29 - page 3, line 50 * * page 4, line 46 - page 5, line 26 * * page 5, line 33 - page 5, line 37 * * page 6, line 2 - page 6, line 10 * * page 6, line 20 - page 6, line 54 * * page 7, line 5 - page 7, line 17 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 15 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 39 * * figures 1-4,6-8 * [X] 12;
 [Y]EP0438136  (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5,8,10,14,15,17-20 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 26 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 18 * * column 5, line 52 - column 8, line 35 * * column 9, line 13 - column 9, line 56 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]EP0545284  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 14 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 8 * * column 10, line 18 - column 11, line 20 * * figures 1,7,10,15,21 * [A] 16;
 [A]US5039614  (DEKMEZIAN ARMENAG [US], et al) [A] 4-6,14 * column 3, line 62 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 1,5 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0508531  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-4,14,17,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 5 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 31 * * figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 8 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 21 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 17 *;
 [A]US4777832  (PRODOSMO ARMANDO [IT], et al) [A] 4,14,19,20 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 52 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH01234144
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891213), vol. 013, no. 560, Database accession no. (M - 906), [A] 6,9 * abstract *
International search[A]US5525515  (BLATTNER FREDERICK R [US]);
 [A]US4691850  (KIRSCHMANN JOHN D [US], et al);
 [A]US4410020  (LORENZ ADRIAN [CH]);
 [A]US4934419  (LAMONT IAIN A J [GB], et al)
ExaminationEP0810438