Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979595

EP0979595 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MICROWAVE JOINING THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nucon Systems Inc.
Suite 1500, 15th floor, 2 Penn Plaza
New York, NY 10121 / US
[2007/27]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Nucon Systems Inc.
Suite 1500, 15th floor, 2 Penn Plaza
New York, NY 10121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROKHVARGER, Anatoly, E.
Apartment 4B, 1865 Ocean Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11230 / US
02 / KHIZH, Adam, B.
101 Prospect Avenue - 2K
Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hoffmeister, Helmut
Patentanwalt
Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date98915462.010.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US07197
Priority number, dateUS19970043120P10.04.1997         Original published format: US 43120 P
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846047
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979595
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979595
Date:04.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/80, C04B37/00
[2004/30]
Former International [2000/07]H05B6/80, H05B6/72, H05B6/78, C04B37/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG VON KERAMISCHEN DICKWÄNDIGEN STÜCKEN DURCH MIKROWELLEN[2000/07]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR MICROWAVE JOINING THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PARTS[2000/07]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ASSEMBLER PAR MICRO-ONDES DES PIECES EN CERAMIQUE A PAROI EPAISSE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1999National basic fee paid 
06.11.1999Search fee paid 
06.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
27.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2007Fee for grant paid
08.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24]
Request for further processing for:16.08.2005Request for further processing filed
16.08.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.08.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2001
30.04.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
DE05.10.2007
ES15.10.2007
FR29.02.2008
[2008/36]
Former [2008/32]FI04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
ES15.10.2007
FR29.02.2008
Former [2008/28]FI04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
ES15.10.2007
Former [2008/16]FI04.07.2007
ES15.10.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0564359  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 38 * column 1, lines 1-7 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 14 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [X]US4767902  (PALAITH DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, lines 35-52 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0363193  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [A] 2,24 * abstract * * page 4, lines 41-57 * * claims 20-22 *;
 [A]US4606748  (BLAKE RODGER D [US], et al) [A] 2,24 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-13 * * column 1, lines 46-60 * * column 2, lines 63,64 * * claim 1 *
International search[Y]US4757172  (PALAITH DAVID E [US], et al);
 [Y]US4772770  (MATSUI MASAO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4434341  (BUSBY DENNIS L [DE]);
 [Y]US4673782  (KOEPKE GUENTHER [DE], et al);
 [Y]US4456806  (ARIMATSU TOSHIO [JP]);
 [A]US4529857  (MEEK THOMAS T [US], et al);
 [A]US5072087  (APTE PRASAD S [CA], et al)