Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973462

EP0973462 - SURGICAL STENT HAVING A STREAMLINED CONTOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
750 North Daniel's Way, P.O. Box 489
Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US
[2006/18]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
Frantzen, John, J.
424 Poker Flat Road
Copperopolis, CA 95228 / US
For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
750 Daniel's Way P.O. Box 489
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Frantzen, John, J.
424 Poker Flat Road
Copperopolis, CA 95228 / US
For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
750 Daniel's Way, P.O. Box 489
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Frantzen, John, J.
424 Poker Flat Road
Copperopolis, CA 95228 / US
For all designated states
GLOBAL THERAPEUTICS, INC.
2150 West 6th Avenue
Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Frantzen, John, J.
424 Poker Flat Road
Copperopolis, CA 95228 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Former [2002/45]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
c/o Cook (UK) Ltd. Patent Department Monroe House
Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 1LN / GB
Former [2001/01]Johnston, Kenneth Graham
c(o Cook (UK) Ltd. Patent Department Monroe House
Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 1LN / GB
Former [2000/04]Johnston, Kenneth Graham
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date98915475.207.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07249
Priority number, dateUS1997083943410.04.1997         Original published format: US 839434
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844872
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973462
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973462
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:PROFILIERTER CHIRURGISCHER STENT[2000/04]
English:SURGICAL STENT HAVING A STREAMLINED CONTOUR[2000/04]
French:EXTENSEUR CHIRURGICAL AYANT UN CONTOUR PROFILE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase26.10.1999National basic fee paid 
26.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
02.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2006Fee for grant paid
13.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
FR14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/22]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/21]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2008/16]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/21]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/17]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2007/02]AT14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE14.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0274846  (ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 21,23 * * column 13, line 35 - line 57 * * column 15, line 37 - line 50 * * column 16, line 37 - line 48 * * claims 7,13 * [Y] 7,10-19;
 [Y]US5527354  (FONTAINE ARTHUR B [US], et al) [Y] 7,10-19 * figures 1,3,5 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 17 * * claim 4 *;
 [A]EP0734699  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 15 * column 9, line 12 - line 21; figure 11 *
by applicantUS5514154
 US5421955
 US5242399
 US5531741
 US5522882
 US5507771
 US5314444
 US5496277