Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0973878 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0973878



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 531
23.06.2008 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 1
16.06.2008 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
16.06.2008 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
13.06.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 9
15.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
17.04.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.04.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.04.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.03.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
02.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 14
02.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.09.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 49
22.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.09.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
21.01.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.01.2005 Request for change of name Search / examination 55
20.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 17
20.10.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.06.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 21
11.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.08.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 31
03.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 128
13.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 150