Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0973878


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
27.06.2008 Change - divisional application(s) published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
20.06.2008 Withdrawal of application published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
06.05.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2008 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.09.2006 First examination report
20.09.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.05.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
05.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.06.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.01.2005 Change - applicant published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]
11.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.06.2003 First examination report
26.06.2003 Examination report or reply
14.05.2003 Renewal fee
24.06.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
11.06.2002 Renewal fee
31.05.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.05.2001 Renewal fee
09.05.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
07.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication