Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973878

EP0973878 - CONTROLLED DISSOLUTION CROSS-LINKED PROTEIN CRYSTALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Altus Pharmaceuticals Inc.
625 Putnam Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139-4807 / US
[2005/10]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Altus Biologics Inc.
40 Allston Street
Cambridge, MA 02139-4211 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARGOLIN, Alexey, L.
193 Upland Avenue
Newton, MA 02161 / US
02 / PERSICHETTI, Rose, A.
375 Harvard Road
Stow, MA 01775 / US
03 / ST. CLAIR, Nancy, L.
806 East Forest Hill Boulevard
Durham, NC 27707 / US
04 / KHALAF, Nazer, K.
14 Lauf Street
Worcester, MA 01602 / US
05 / SHENOY, Bhami, C.
16 Westgate Drive, T-6
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98915494.310.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07287
Priority number, dateUS1997083466111.04.1997         Original published format: US 834661
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846732
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973878
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N11/00, C12N9/20, A61K7/00, A61K9/52, C11D17/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERNETZTE PROTEINKRISTALLEN MIT KONTROLLIERTER LÖSUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT[2000/04]
English:CONTROLLED DISSOLUTION CROSS-LINKED PROTEIN CRYSTALS[2000/04]
French:DISSOLUTION COMMANDEE DE CRISTAUX RETICULES DE PROTEINE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1999National basic fee paid 
11.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/30]
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP08010903.6  / EP1985699
EP10012060.9  / EP2267122
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200508   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9202617  (VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED) [A] * the whole document *;
 [T]WO9813119  (ALTUS BIOLOGICS INC.) [T] * page 22, line 9 - line 21 * * page 24, line 11 - page 32, line 12 *
 [XY]  - ALEXEY L. MARGOLIN, "Novel crystalline catalysts", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199607), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 223 - 230, XP004035759 [X] 17,19-24,29,39-57,65,67,70,73-75,88,92-96 * page 223, column L, paragraph 2 - page 229, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 229, column R, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1,12,13,18,35-38,58-66

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(96)10031-7
 [Y]  - XU, KUI ET AL, "pH control of the catalytic activity of cross - linked enzyme crystals in organic solvents", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (1996), 118(41), 9815-9819 CODEN: JACSAT;ISSN: 0002-7863, XP002072836 [Y] 1,12,13,18,35-38,58-66 * page 9817, column L, paragraph 3 - page 9818, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 9815, column R, paragraph 2 - page 9816, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja961596m
 [X]  - JIM J. LALONDE ET AL., "Cross-linked crystals of Candida rugosa lipase: highly efficient catalysts for the resolution of chiral esters", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (19950705), vol. 117, pages 6845 - 6852, XP002041053 [X] 17,19-24,29,39-42,45-48,57,67,70,73-75,88,92-95 * abstract * * page 6846, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 6848, column L, paragraph 2 - page 6850, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00131a006