Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981295

EP0981295 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMYOCARDIAL DIRECT CORONARY REVASCULARIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.06.2010  [2010/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
Transvascular, Inc.
1505-D Adams Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAKOWER, Joshua
450 Tyndall Street
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
02 / FLAHERTY, J., Christopher
766 La Prenda Road
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
03 / MACHOLD, Timothy, R.
56 Bernal Avenue
Moss Beach, CA 94024 / US
04 / WHITT, Jason, Brian
2554 Franklin Street
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
05 / TUMAS, Margaret, W.
3 Rae Court
Orinda, CA 94563 / US
06 / LAMSON, Theodore, C.
4693 Ithaca Way
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
07 / JENSEN, Marc
P.O. Box 2126
Los Gatos, CA 95031 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Whitaker, Iain Mark , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Ltd
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans
Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Whitaker, Iain Mark , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans
Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2006/50]Whitaker, Iain Mark , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2000/09]Whitaker, Iain Mark , et al
Sommerville & Rushton Business Link Building 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date98915524.713.04.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US07384
Priority number, dateUS1997083729511.04.1997         Original published format: US 837295
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9846115
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981295
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00, A61F2/06, A61F2/14, A61M1/12, A61M29/02
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR TRANSMYOKARDIALEN DIREKTEN KORONARREVASKULARISATION[2000/09]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMYOCARDIAL DIRECT CORONARY REVASCULARIZATION[2000/09]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR LA REVASCULARISATION CORONARIENNE DIRECTE TRANSMYOCARDIQUE[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1999National basic fee paid 
11.11.1999Search fee paid 
11.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
15.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/24]
28.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/24]
Request for further processing for:05.07.2007Request for further processing filed
05.07.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.07.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XE]US5776164  (RIPART ALAIN [FR]);
 [X]US5554152  (AITA MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5304220  (MAGINOT THOMAS J [US]);
 [Y]US5500014  (QUIJANO R C [US], et al);
 [A]US5222980  (GEALOW KENDRA K [US]);
 [AP]US5620439  (ABELA GEORGE S [US], et al)