Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973900

EP0973900 - flt3 LIGAND CHIMERIC PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D. Searle & Co.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
G.D. SEARLE & CO.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENNETT, Dennis, A.
P.O. Box 923
Chesterfield, MO 63006 / US
02 / STATEN, Nicholas, R.
859 Queen Ann Place
St. Louis, MO 63122 / US
03 / BAUER, S., Christopher
4656 Orchard Road
New Haven, MO 63068 / US
04 / McKEARN, John, P.
18612 Babler Meadows Drive
Glencoe, MO 63038 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2006/08]Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2002/51]Strych, Werner Dr. , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 70 08 60
81308 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr. , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98915573.410.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07511
Priority number, dateUS1997083702611.04.1997         Original published format: US 837026
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846750
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973900
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C07K14/475, A61K38/18
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:CHIMÄRE DES FLT3 LIGANDEN[2000/04]
English:flt3 LIGAND CHIMERIC PROTEINS[2000/04]
French:PROTEINES CHIMERIQUES CONTENANT LE LIGAND flt3[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/17]
24.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0627487  (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [X] 1,18,32 * abstract * [A] ;
 [X]WO9526199  (CYTOMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1,18,32 * abstract *;
 [E]WO9817810  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [E] 1-5,9,10,15-18,22,23,27,32-39 * abstract * * page 149 - page 151 * * page 230 - page 232 * * page 447 - page 450 * * page 639 - page 645 *
 [A]  - HANNUM C ET AL, "LIGAND FOR FLT3/FLK2 RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE REGULATES GROWTH OF GAEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS AND IS ENCODED BY VARIANT RNAS", NATURE, (19940414), vol. 368, pages 643 - 648, XP002057419 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/368643a0
 [A]  - HUNTE B ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF FLT3 LIGAND ON THE GROWTH OF MYELOID AND LYMPHOID PROGENITOR CELLS", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (19940821), vol. 22, page 720, XP000578356 [A] * the whole document *