Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975279

EP0975279 - Prostheses with selectively welded crossing strands [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]PROSTHESES WITH SELECTIVELY WELDED CROSSING STRANDS
[2006/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth
Minnesota 55442-1656 / US
[2007/18]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442-1656 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROYCHOWDHURY, Suranjan
1300 Worcester Road Apt.P.208
Framingham, MA 01702 / US
02 / PINCHUK, Leonard
9834 S.W. 111th Terrace
Miami, FL 33176 / US
03 / HOFMANN, Eugen
Hardhof 14
CH-8064 Zürich / CH
04 / HANKH, Susanne
Buttingerstrasse 26
CH-5612 Villmergen / CH
05 / O'CONNOR, Michael, G.
1249 - 130th Lane N.E.
Blaine, MN 55434 / US
06 / RAEDER-DEVENS, Jennifer, E.
83 Cambridge Street
St. Paul, MN 55105 / US
07 / BADEN, Jeannine, B.
101 N. Glenbrook Road 7
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
08 / KLIMA, Daniel, J.
1045 - 16th Avenue South
St. Cloud, MN 56301 / US
[2000/28]
Former [2000/05]01 / ROYCHOWDHURY, Suranjan
Apartment 301, 10111 Cedar Lake Road
Minnetonka, MN 55446 / US
02 / PINCHUK, Leonard
9834 S.W. 111th Terrace
Miami, FL 33176 / US
03 / HOFMANN, Eugen
Hardhof 14
CH-8064 Zürich / CH
04 / HANKH, Susanne
Buttingerstrasse 26
CH-5612 Villmergen / CH
05 / O'CONNOR, Michael, G.
1249 - 130th Lane N.E.
Blaine, MN 55434 / US
06 / RAEDER-DEVENS, Jennifer, E.
83 Cambridge Street
St. Paul, MN 55105 / US
07 / BADEN, Jeannine, B.
101 N. Glenbrook Road 7
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
08 / KLIMA, Daniel, J.
1045 - 16th Avenue South
St. Cloud, MN 56301 / US
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/12]Schildberg, Peter
Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/05]Sturt, Clifford Mark
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date98915625.215.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07821
Priority number, dateUS19970042226P15.04.1997         Original published format: US 42226 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846168
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975279
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975279
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Prothese mit ausgewählt geschweissten gekreuzten Fäden[2006/49]
English:Prostheses with selectively welded crossing strands[2006/49]
French:Prothèses à brins croisés sélectivement soudés[2006/49]
Former [2000/05]PROTHESE MIT AUSGEWÄHLT GESCHWEISSTEN GEKREUZTEN FÄDEN
Former [2000/05]PROSTHESES WITH SELECTIVELY WELDED CROSSING STRANDS
Former [2000/05]PROTHESES AVEC BRINS CROISES SELECTIVEMENT SOUDES
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Search fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
04.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2007Fee for grant paid
10.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
CY02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
FR02.05.2007
IT02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
ES13.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/52]AT02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
FR02.05.2007
IT02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
ES13.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
Former [2008/23]AT02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
IT02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
ES13.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
FR28.12.2007
Former [2008/21]AT02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
ES13.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
Former [2008/16]AT02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
ES13.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5171262  (MACGREGOR DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,5-10,14-16,19-21,24,25,29 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 41 * [Y] 2,3,11-13;
 [DY]US5716396  (WILLIAMS JR NORMAN F [US]) [DY] 2,3,11-13 * column 4, line 6 - column 7, line 51 *;
 [A]US5628787  (MAYER DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-34 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 50 * * column 9, line 4 - line 18 *;
 [PA]EP0801934  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [PA] 1-34 * column 4, line 5 - column 7, line 53 *
International search[X]US5575818  (PINCHUK LEONARD [US]);
 [X]US5171262  (MACGREGOR DAVID C [US]);
 [X]US5015253  (MACGREGOR DAVID C [US]);
 [Y]US5304200  (SPAULDING RONALD N [US])