Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979074

EP0979074 - TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF MENOPAUSAL SYMPTOMS AND OSTEOPOROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novogen Inc.
c/o Corporate Agents Inc. 1013 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Novogen Inc.
1013 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KELLY, Graham, Edmund
1,47 Coolawin Road
Northbridge, NSW 2063 / AU
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie , et al
Cabinet ORES 36 Rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Goulard, Sophie , et al
Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris Cedex / FR
Former [2000/07]Mouget-Goniot, Claire , et al
Cabinet Orès, 6, Avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98916669.901.05.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998AU00313
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0656801.05.1997         Original published format: AU PO656897
AU1997PP0081408.12.1997         Original published format: AU PP081497
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850026
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979074
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search reportAU12.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/35
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
Extension statesAL25.10.1999
LT25.10.1999
LV25.10.1999
MK25.10.1999
RO25.10.1999
SI25.10.1999
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG KLIMAKTERIUMSYMPTOMEN UND DER OSTEOPOROSE[2000/07]
English:TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF MENOPAUSAL SYMPTOMS AND OSTEOPOROSIS[2000/07]
French:TRAITEMENT OU PREVENTION DES SYMPTOMES MENOPAUSIQUES ET DE L'OSTEOPOROSE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Search fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/46]
11.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9825588  (GORBACH SHERWOOD L [US]) [E] 1-31 * page 1, lines 18-21 * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 1; claims 1,3 *;
 [E]WO9821946  (INTERNUTRIA INC [US]) [E] 1-31 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 16 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 3 * * page 10, lines 1-11 * * page 13, lines 11-18 *;
 [X]EP0135172  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,14-21,30 * the whole document *;
 [X]  KNIGHT D C ET AL, "PHYTOESTROGENS - A SHORT REVIEW", MATURITAS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS IRELAND LTD, IR, (1995), vol. 22, no. 3, ISSN 0378-5122, pages 167 - 175, XP000878797 [X] 1-31 * page 168, column R, lines 21-28 * * page 169, column R, line 6 - page 171, column L, line 30 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5122(95)00937-G
International search[X]WO9323069  (KELLY GRAHAM EDMUND [AU]);
 [X]WO9423716  (UNIV TUFTS MED [US]);
 [X]US5569459  (SHLYANKEVICH MARK [US]);
 [X]WO9804248  (ENERGETICS [US]);
 [X]US5352384  (SHEN JEROME L [US]);
 [X]JP02067218  ;
 [X]US5523087  (SHLYANKEVICH MARK [US]);
 [X]US5516528  (HUGHES CLAUDE L [US], et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (C-722), page 98; & JP,A,02 067 218 (NAGAKURA SEIYAKU KK) 7 March 1990.,
 [Y]  - JOANNOU G. et al., "A Urinary Profile Study of Dietary Phytoestrogens. The Identification and Mode of Metabolism of New Isoflavanoids", J. STEROID BIOCHEM. MOLEC. BIOL., 54(3/4), (1995), pages 167-184.,
 [Y]  - PRADHAN S.N. (Ed.), Pharmacology in Medicine: Principles and Practice, (SP PRESS INTERNATIONAL INC., MARYLAND, USA, 1986), pages 466-467.,
 [Y]  - WINTROBE M.M. (Ed.) et al., Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, 7th Ed., (McGRAW-HILL KOGAKUSHA LTD., TOKYO, JAPAN, 1974), page 1968.,
 [Y]  - REYNOLDS J.E.F. (Ed.), Martindale: The Extra Pharmacopoeia, 13th Ed., (THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, LONDON, UK, 1993), pages 856.1, 1060.1, 1169.1, 1170.1.,
 [Y]  - BERKOW R. (Ed.) et al., The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, 16th Ed., (MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, RAHWAY, USA, 1992), pages 1357-1359, 1793-1795.,
 [Y]  - BUDAVAN S. (Ed.) et al., The Merck Index, 11th Ed., (MERCK & CO. INC., RAHWAY, USA, 1989), page 663, Monograph No. 4157.,