EP1073585 - HIGH SPEED LINEAR BAGGING MACHINE AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLOPAK INC. 4755 Boulevard des Grandes Prairies St. Léonard, Québec H1R 1A6 / CA | [2002/49] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states GLOPAK INC. 4755 Boulevard des Grandes Prairies St. Leonard, Quebec H1R 1A6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURGATROYD, John Green Glen Binns Lane Glusburn Keiguly West Yorkshire BD20 8JJ / GB | 02 /
WHITEHILL, W., A. 6 Parkside Halifax HX3 0ED / GB | 03 /
SAVOURY, Rick 17 White Ash Drive Markham, Ontario L3P 4N1 / CA | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98916685.5 | 21.04.1998 | [2001/06] | WO1998CA00303 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954206 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073585 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073585 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/18, B65B43/34 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
B65B43/34 (EP,US);
B65B25/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | LINEARE HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSBEUTELFÜLLVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2001/06] | English: | HIGH SPEED LINEAR BAGGING MACHINE AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2001/06] | French: | ENSACHEUSE LINEAIRE ULTRARAPIDE ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | PT | 05.03.2003 | CY | 21.04.2003 | LU | 21.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 21.04.2003 | ||
LU | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
LU | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 05.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3451192 (IRWIN JERE F) [A] 1,21 * column 10, line 10 - line 44; figures 1-3,16-20 *; | [A]US4671048 (RADEMACHER ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1,21,22 * column 9, line 6 - line 24; figures 1,2,9,12 *; | [A]GB2287925 (QUATRE MAINS BV [NL]) [A] 1,21 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [X]NL1001892C (HUITE WOLTHUIZEN [NL]) [X] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0764584 (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,20,21* figure 14; claim 1 *; | [E]US5743071 (WOLTHUIZEN HUITE [NL]) [E] 1,21 * column 2, line 57 - line 61; figures 2,4 * |