EP0977873 - METHOD FOR CLEAVAGE OF FUSION PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SemBioSys Genetics Inc. Bay 110, 2985-23rd Avenue N.E. Calgary, Alberta T1Y 7L3 / CA | [2006/27] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states SemBioSys Genetics, Inc. 609-14 Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLONEY, Maurice 34 Edgebrook Cove, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A 5N5 / CA | 02 /
ALCANTARA, Joenel 3 Castledale Place N.E. Calgary, Alberta T3J 1Y4 / CA | 03 /
VAN ROOIJEN, Gijs 3223 Bearspaw Drive N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2L 1T1 / CA | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2000/06] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98916746.5 | 23.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998CA00398 | Priority number, date | US19970044254P | 25.04.1997 Original published format: US 44254 P | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849326 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977873 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977873 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/15, C07K14/815, C07K14/61, C12N9/50, C12N15/57, A61K38/58, A61K38/27, A23L1/305 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C12N15/62 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
C07K14/815 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C12N9/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/75 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPALTUNG VON FUSIONPROTEINEN | [2000/06] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEAVAGE OF FUSION PROTEINS | [2000/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE CLIVAGE DE PROTEINES HYBRIDES | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | LU | 23.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0134662 (GENEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9621029 (UNIV TECHNOLOGIES INT [CA]) [DX] 1-47 * page 4, lines 13-29 * * page 14, lines 21-29 * * page 20, lines 1-10 * * page 24, lines 12-29 * * page 29, lines 3-14; example 8 * * page 52, lines 5-10 *; | [X] - C-Z. GIAM AND I. BOROS, "In vivo and in vitro autoprocessing of human immunodeficiency virus protease expressed in Escherichia coli", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (1988), vol. 263, no. 29, pages 14617 - 14620, XP000001149 [X] 1-4,7,9,19 * the whole document * | [X] - D.S. MONTGOMERY ET AL.,, "Expression of an autoprocessing CAT-HIV-1 proteinase fusion protein: Purification to homogeneity of the released 99 residue protein", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, NEY YORK, NY, US, (1991), vol. 175, no. 3, pages 784 - 794, XP000178318 [X] 1-4,7,9,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(91)91634-O | [A] - D.L. PARMENTER ET AL.,, "Production of biologically active hirudin in plant seeds using oleosin partitioning", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, BE, (1995), vol. 29, pages 1167 - 1180, XP002005045 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020460 | [DA] - M.T. MCCAMAN AND D.B. CUMMINGS, "A mutated bovine prochymosin zymogen can be activated without proteolitic processing at low pH", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (1986), vol. 261, no. 33, pages 15345 - 15348, XP002071807 [DA] 1-9 * the whole document * |