Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968346

EP0968346 - LIGHT SUPPORTING FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mühl, Ernst
Harbacher Strasse 19A
35447 Reiskirchen-Ettingshausen / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98916803.426.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DE00564
Priority number, dateDE199710754726.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19707547
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838406
Date:03.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968346
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:E04H15/28, E04B1/32
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:LEICHTES TRAGWERK[2000/01]
English:LIGHT SUPPORTING FRAMEWORK[2000/01]
French:OSSATURE PORTEUSE LEGERE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
11.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/48]
25.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2000
28.02.200104   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2001
28.02.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE8810535U  (W.-D. WIENSTRATH) [Y] 1,3,4,9,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2239114  (ZANGENBERG GMBH & CO HEINRICH) [Y] 1,3,4,9,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2321943  (BUNDESREP DEUTSCHLAND) [Y] 4 * the whole document *