Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002355

EP1002355 - LOW POWER HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE UNCONNECTED TO MAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lang, Oliver
Waghäuseler Str. 9-10
10715 Berlin / DE
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date98916810.924.02.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998DE00584
Priority number, dateDE199713455704.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734557
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9908361
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002355
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002355
Date:24.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/35
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   LI,   NL [2000/21]
TitleGerman:NETZANSCHLUSSLOSES KLEINLEISTUNGS-HAUSHALTSGERÄT[2000/21]
English:LOW POWER HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE UNCONNECTED TO MAINS[2000/21]
French:APPAREIL MENAGER DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE SANS RACCORDEMENT AU RESEAU[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2000National basic fee paid 
25.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
31.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
13.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2001Fee for grant paid
23.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)25.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42]
Request for further processing for:29.03.2001Request for further processing filed
30.03.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.04.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR24.10.2001
GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
GR25.01.2002
AT24.02.2002
CH28.02.2002
LI28.02.2002
ES30.04.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2004/51]GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
GR25.01.2002
AT24.02.2002
CH28.02.2002
LI28.02.2002
ES30.04.2002
Former [2004/04]GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
AT24.02.2002
CH28.02.2002
LI28.02.2002
ES30.04.2002
Former [2003/37]GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
AT24.02.2002
CH28.02.2002
LI28.02.2002
Former [2003/16]GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
CH28.02.2002
LI28.02.2002
Former [2003/09]GB24.10.2001
NL24.10.2001
Former [2003/01]GB24.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0271162  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3245363  (PASCHEK GUENTER) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0390253  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *