Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970497

EP0970497 - SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moeller GmbH
Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11
53115 Bonn / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / THILKER, Lutz
Höhscheider Weg 12
D-42799 Leichlingen / DE
02 / ZACHARIAS, Albert
Rembrandtstrasse 18
D-56566 Neuwied / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98916914.911.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01386
Priority number, dateDE199711295827.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712958
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844524
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970497
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970497
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01H1/50, H01H3/60
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/04]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SCHALTVORRICHTUNG[2000/02]
English:SWITCHING DEVICE[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase28.08.1999National basic fee paid 
28.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
18.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2002Fee for grant paid
01.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.12.2002
AT11.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
[2004/31]
Former [2004/22]GB18.12.2002
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1048980  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29510909U  (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2037552  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5 * page 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *;
 [A]DE1025041  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0353950  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4201956  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *