Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968322

EP0968322 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MILLING BATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LÖHR, Karsten
Ochsensteige 22/2
D-89075 Ulm / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98916915.611.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01388
Priority number, dateDE199711056314.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710563
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841672
Date:24.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968322
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968322
Date:10.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C23F1/46
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN VON FRÄSBÄDERN[2000/01]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MILLING BATHS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXPLOITATION DE BAINS DE FRAISAGE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase06.10.1999National basic fee paid 
06.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
14.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2003Fee for grant paid
11.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.12.2003
GB10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
IT10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR10.12.2003
GB10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
Former [2004/46]GB10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
Former [2004/45]GB10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/40]IE10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/33]NL10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE10.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9527681  (WEIZMANN KIRYAT MEMBRANE PROD ;WHALLEY KEVIN (GB); YACUBOWICZ HENI) [X] 9 * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 1; figure 2 * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 1 * [Y] 1;
 [X]US5587083  (TWARDOWSKI ZBIGNIEW) [X] 9 * column 7, lines 8-11; figure 1 *;
 [DY]EP0465822  (GRAVER CO) [DY] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5118399  (VAUGHAN DANIEL J);
 [A]WO8501670  (GNB BATTERIES INC)