Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991836

EP0991836 - HINGE FOR METAL CUPBOARD DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ramsauer, Dieter
Am Neuhauskothen 20
D-42555 Velbert / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Stratmann, Ernst
Strücker Weg 14
40699 Erkrath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing.
Schadowplatz 9
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98916976.817.03.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP01539
Priority number, dateDE1997210853U23.06.1997         Original published format: DE 29710853 U
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859138
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991836
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991836
Date:26.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:E05D7/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SCHARNIER FÜR BLECHSCHRANKTÜREN[2000/15]
English:HINGE FOR METAL CUPBOARD DOORS[2000/15]
French:CHARNIERE POUR PORTES D'ARMOIRE METALLIQUE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase01.12.1999National basic fee paid 
01.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2001Fee for grant paid
27.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2885722  (HALLIDAY JOHN J) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-7 *;
 [XY]DE9413891U  (HAHN GMBH & CO KG DR [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,14 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,9,12;
 [X]EP0140114  (MAYER & CO [AT]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]EP0118050  (TEFO AG [CH]) [Y] 3,4,12 * page 5, line 23 - page 8, line 4; figures 2,5-7 * [A] 9,10;
 [Y]DE1809408  (SCHWARTE FITSCHENFAB FRANZ) [Y] 9 * page 3, paragraph 7; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3204677  (HAHN GMBH & CO KG DR [DE]) [A] 10 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE2951712