Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973630

EP0973630 - LINEAR GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
INA-Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1 - 3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG
91072 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RUDY, Dietmar
Pfaffstrasse 1
D-67655 Kaiserslautern / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98916990.918.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01560
Priority number, dateDE199711501411.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19715014
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846393
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973630
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973630
Date:09.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B23Q1/28
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/04]
TitleGerman:LINEARFÜHRUNG[2000/04]
English:LINEAR GUIDE[2000/04]
French:GUIDAGE LINEAIRE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
19.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2008Fee for grant paid
25.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]DE29505080U  (G & M ZIMMER OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 9, paragraphs 2-4; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4953988  (TSUKADA TORU [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4334424  (CKD CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 7,8 *;
 [A]DE1448549  (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [A] 2 * figure 4 *;
 [X]DE1765353  (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH [DE]) [X] 5 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2246088  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5302062  (BABA SADAMU [JP], et al) [A] 5 * abstract *